LA HB238 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-03 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-03 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the telecommunications tax for the deaf (RE1 +$500,000 SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the telecommunications tax for the deaf (RE1 +$500,000 SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 238, FINAL PASSAGE (#28) (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 16. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-16 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2013-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/16/2013. |
2013-04-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-10 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-03-26 | House | Prefiled. |