LA HB236 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Effective date: August 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the office of debt recovery to utilize the offset of certain gaming winnings as a means to collect delinquent debt owed to state agencies (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the office of debt recovery to utilize the offset of certain gaming winnings as a means to collect delinquent debt owed to state agencies (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 236 ADOPT (#1769) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 236 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1656) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 236 MOTION TO CONSIDER ON FINAL DAY (#1655) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 236 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1279) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 236 FINAL PASSAGE (#1318) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 236 FINAL PASSAGE (#553) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-23HouseEffective date: August 1, 2014.
2014-06-23HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 816.
2014-06-04HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2014-06-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
2014-06-02HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2014-06-02HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2014-06-02SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2014-06-02SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2014-06-02HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 84, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2014-06-02HouseConference Committee report received.
2014-05-29SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2014-05-29HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2014-05-29SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Martiny, and Murray.
2014-05-29HouseHouse conferees appointed: Broadwater, Robideaux, and Stuart Bishop.
2014-05-28SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2014-05-28HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2014-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2014.
2014-05-22HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2014-05-22SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2014-05-21SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2014-05-20SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2014-05-19SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2014-04-28SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2014-04-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2014-04-23HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2014-04-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2014.
2014-04-16HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-04-15HouseReported with amendments (17-0).
2014-03-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2014-02-21HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014.
2014-02-19HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2014-02-19HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=14rs&b=HB236&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=872529
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=893885
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=896300
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=912796
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=916078
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=893230
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=893715
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=894136
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=896216
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=896212
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=905397
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=905815
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=909219
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=909434
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=872558
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=881545
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=894028
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=896701
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=897089
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=905654
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=912410
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=913739
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=918049
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=896272
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=907485
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=912444
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=912448
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=912477

Bill Comments

feedback