LA HB236 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-29 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increases penalties for certain oyster harvesting violations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases penalties for certain oyster harvesting violations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 236 FINAL PASSAGE (#443) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 236 FINAL PASSAGE (#115) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-29HouseEffective date: August 1, 2013.
2013-05-29HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 35.
2013-05-21HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2013-05-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2013-05-20HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2013-05-16HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2013-05-16SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-05-14SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-05-13SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-05-08SenateReported favorably.
2013-04-29SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2013-04-25SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2013-04-24HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2013-04-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 4/24/2013.
2013-04-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2013-04-17HouseReported with amendments (15-0) (Regular).
2013-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2013-04-01HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
2013-03-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2013-03-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=13rs&b=HB236&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=832202
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839437
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841712
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=848852
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=853534
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839135
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=838390
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=840060
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=832233
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839595
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841733
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=858935
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841440
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=848721

Bill Comments

feedback