LA HB235 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the dollar amount for the exception to public bid law applicable to the purchase of vehicles by local government units
Title
Increases the dollar amount for the exception to public bid law applicable to the purchase of vehicles by local government units
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - House Vote on HB 235 FINAL PASSAGE (#47) (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/20/2024. |
2024-03-19 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-18 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |