LA HB233 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Becomes HB 1143.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Becomes HB 1143.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the regulation of autonomous vehicles operating on the highways of this state
Title
Provides relative to the regulation of autonomous vehicles operating on the highways of this state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Becomes HB 1143. |
2016-04-18 | House | Reported by substitute (16-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |