LA HB227 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to sealing and delivering depositions
Title
Provides relative to sealing and delivering depositions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 227 ADOPT (#923) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 227 MOTION TO ADOPT (#908) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 227 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#632) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 227 FINAL PASSAGE (#432) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 227 FINAL PASSAGE (#42) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 227 MOTION TO ADOPT (#908) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 227 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#632) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 227 FINAL PASSAGE (#432) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 227 FINAL PASSAGE (#42) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 268. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-07 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2017-06-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/17. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2017-06-05 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Shadoin, Garofalo, and Gregory Miller. |
2017-06-04 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Ward, Luneau, and Martiny. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 2, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/17. |
2017-05-23 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-04-25 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/17. |
2017-04-19 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0-1). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |