LA HB225 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the creation of the Krewe of NYX prestige license plate (EG INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the creation of the Krewe of NYX prestige license plate (EG INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 225 FINAL PASSAGE (#60) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-03-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/2016. |
2016-03-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |