LA HB222 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to prior offenses regarding the illegal carrying of weapons
Title
Provides with respect to prior offenses regarding the illegal carrying of weapons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 222, FINAL PASSAGE (#1182) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 222, FINAL PASSAGE (#672) (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 222, FINAL PASSAGE (#672) (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Effective date: August 1, 2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 383. | |
2012-05-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-22 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-21 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-21 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-17 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-16 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-15 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-05-08 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | |
2012-05-07 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-26 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/3/2012. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-25 | Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-02-24 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2012. | |
2012-02-24 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-02-24 | Prefiled. |