LA HB220 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the purpose of certain dedications of gaming proceeds deposited into the Louisiana Agricultural Finance Authority Fund
Title
Changes the purpose of certain dedications of gaming proceeds deposited into the Louisiana Agricultural Finance Authority Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2016-03-22 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |