LA HB22 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Effective date: June 30, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Effective date: June 30, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the calculation of final average compensation in the Sheriffs' Pension and Relief Fund (EN DECREASE APV)
Title
Provides relative to the calculation of final average compensation in the Sheriffs' Pension and Relief Fund (EN DECREASE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 22 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#712) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 22 FINAL PASSAGE (#581) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 22 FINAL PASSAGE (#141) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 22 FINAL PASSAGE (#581) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 22 FINAL PASSAGE (#141) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | House | Effective date: June 30, 2013. |
2013-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 231. |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2013-05-29 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/02/2013. |
2013-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/25/2013. |
2013-04-23 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2013-02-08 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/8/2013. |
2013-02-07 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2013-02-07 | House | Prefiled. |