LA HB218 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to Baton Rouge City Court probation officers (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Title
Provides relative to Baton Rouge City Court probation officers (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 218 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1036) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 218 ADOPT (#1024) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 218 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#977) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 218 FINAL PASSAGE (#891) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 218 FINAL PASSAGE (#469) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 218 ADOPT (#1024) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 218 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#977) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 218 FINAL PASSAGE (#891) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 218 FINAL PASSAGE (#469) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2019. |
2019-06-20 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 379. |
2019-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2019-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays. |
2019-06-06 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2019-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Gary Smith, Colomb, and Claitor. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2019-06-05 | House | House conferees appointed: Marcelle, Jackson, and McFarland. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2019-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2019-06-04 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/19. |
2019-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-21 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19. |
2019-05-15 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19. |
2019-05-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |