LA HB217 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-22 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-22 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that neither the employer nor insurer is obligated to authorize an initial evaluation
Title
Provides that neither the employer nor insurer is obligated to authorize an initial evaluation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (11-5). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2020-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2020-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |