LA HB217 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 01/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increases certain special permit fees and dedicates the proceeds of the fee increase into the Construction Subfund of the Transportation Trust Fund (EN +$8,584,000 SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases certain special permit fees and dedicates the proceeds of the fee increase into the Construction Subfund of the Transportation Trust Fund (EN +$8,584,000 SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 217 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#884) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 217 FINAL PASSAGE (#842) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 217 FINAL PASSAGE (#57) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseEffective date: 01/01/2020.
2019-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 301.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-01SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-31SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-27SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-27SenateSenate Committee amendments read and adopted.
2019-04-30SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-04-29SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-25HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/25/19.
2019-04-23HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-22HouseReported favorably (14-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB217&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119206
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125862
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127815
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142149
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144231
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127517
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137343
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139005
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142011
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141938
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119232
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124659
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125971
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126480
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127930
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128111
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137514
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142259
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1147312
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127784
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141169

Bill Comments

feedback