LA HB217 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the "Carroll High School" specialty license plate

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the "Carroll High School" specialty license plate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 217 FINAL PASSAGE (#577) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote on HB 217 FINAL PASSAGE (#15) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-10HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 71.
2018-05-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-04-27HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-04-26SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-24SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-23SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2018-03-19SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-03-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-15HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2018-03-14HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/15/18.
2018-03-14HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-13HouseReported favorably (15-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2018-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2018-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback