LA HB217 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires voter approval prior to the imposition of civil fines for traffic violations based on evidence captured by automated traffic enforcement systems (OR DECREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
Requires voter approval prior to the imposition of civil fines for traffic violations based on evidence captured by automated traffic enforcement systems (OR DECREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2013-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |