LA HB212 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of bonds for remediation and restoration of certain oilfield sites (OR SEE FISC NOTE SD RV)
Title
Authorizes the issuance of bonds for remediation and restoration of certain oilfield sites (OR SEE FISC NOTE SD RV)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-12 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-12 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=11RS&billid=HB212 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=738956 |