LA HB211 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Effective date: 08/01/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to state banks and credit unions providing financial services to cannabis-related legitimate businesses and service providers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to state banks and credit unions providing financial services to cannabis-related legitimate businesses and service providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 211 FINAL PASSAGE (#554) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 211 HB 211 BY JORDAN (#215) (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09HouseEffective date: 08/01/20.
2020-06-09HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 100.
2020-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-05-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-29HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2020-05-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-20HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/20.
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-13HouseReported favorably (14-0-1).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2020-02-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020.
2020-02-24HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2020-02-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB211&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1158884
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170985
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174654
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177762
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180955
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174116
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1158895
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171219
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174704
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1186444
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174639
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177589

Bill Comments

feedback