LA HB21 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to membership and benefits of the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (EN INCREASE APV)
Title
Provides relative to membership and benefits of the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (EN INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Bacala [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 21 FINAL PASSAGE (#403) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 21 HB 21 BY BACALA (#105) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 21 HB 21 BY BACALA (#105) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2020. |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 249. |
2020-06-01 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-28 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-01-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/24/2020. |
2020-01-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-01-24 | House | Prefiled. |