LA HB209 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows governing authorities of certain parishes to adopt certain regulations related to firearms and ammunition
Title
Allows governing authorities of certain parishes to adopt certain regulations related to firearms and ammunition
Sponsors
Rep. Mandie Landry [D] | Sen. Royce Duplessis [D] | Rep. Matthew Willard [D] | Rep. Jason Hughes [D] |
Rep. Aimee Freeman [D] | Rep. Delisha Boyd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-02-25 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/25/2022. |
2022-02-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-02-25 | House | Prefiled. |