LA HB202 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the crime of theft of USPS mail (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the crime of theft of USPS mail (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Carver [R] | Rep. Daryl Adams [I] | Rep. Chad Boyer [R] | Rep. Vincent Cox [R] |
Rep. Alonzo Knox [D] | Rep. Vanessa Caston Lafleur [D] | Rep. Pat Moore [D] | Rep. Joy Walters [D] |
Rep. Jeff Wiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 202 FINAL PASSAGE (#181) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2024. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |