LA HB202 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for an increased vote requirement when enacting certain new tax incentives (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for an increased vote requirement when enacting certain new tax incentives (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2021.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-26HouseReported with amendments (13-0-1).
2021-04-19HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-15HouseReported with amendments (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-03-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021.
2021-03-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-03-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB202&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1206634
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214390
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217247
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214335
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217202
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217121
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219930
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1206638
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212453
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214448
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214586
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217565

Bill Comments 750

feedback