LA HB202 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to applications for licenses, permits, or certificates issued by the Department of Agriculture and Forestry
Title
Provides with respect to applications for licenses, permits, or certificates issued by the Department of Agriculture and Forestry
Sponsors
Rep. John Anders [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 202 FINAL PASSAGE (#525) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 202 FINAL PASSAGE (#152) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 202 FINAL PASSAGE (#152) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-05 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 104. |
2013-05-30 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2013. |
2013-04-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (16-0) (Local and Consent). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2013-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013. |
2013-03-22 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2013-03-22 | House | Prefiled. |