LA HB2 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget
Title
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 2 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1264) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 ADOPT (#1144) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 2 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#859) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#612) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#431) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 ADOPT (#1144) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 2 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#859) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#612) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#431) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-07-20 | House | Veto message read. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-07-01 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2021. |
2021-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor with one or more line-item vetoes. Becomes Act No. 485. |
2021-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021. |
2021-06-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-10 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2021-06-10 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 104, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2021-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. |
2021-06-10 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2021-06-02 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Cortez, Allain, and Peterson. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Notice of change in House Conference Committee membership. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2021-05-27 | House | Notice of change in House conferees: Bishop,Stefanski, Schexnayder. |
2021-05-27 | House | House conferees appointed: Bishop, Magee, and Schexnayder. |
2021-05-27 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2021-05-27 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 5/27. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-12 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 1 for 05/13/2021. |
2021-05-12 | House | Rules suspended. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2021-04-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2021-04-21 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |