LA HB2 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget
Title
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/20. |
2020-05-22 | House | Notice given. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported with amendments (20-0). |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-03-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |