LA HB2 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective date: June 19, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective date: June 19, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget
Title
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 2 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1127) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 ADOPT (#1130) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 2 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1022) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#927) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 AMENDMENT # 3623 BY CLAITOR HB 2 BY ROBIDEAUX (#926) (Y: 10 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#563) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 2 AMENDMENT # 3876 BY BURRELL MOTION TO ADOPT (#561) (Y: 26 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2015-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 2 AMENDMENT # 3932 BY JACKSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#562) (Y: 41 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 2 AMENDMENT # 3802 BY BURRELL MOTION TO ADOPT (#560) (Y: 47 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 2 AMENDMENT # 3875 BY WILLIAMS A. MOTION TO ADOPT (#559) (Y: 35 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 ADOPT (#1130) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 2 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1022) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#927) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 AMENDMENT # 3623 BY CLAITOR HB 2 BY ROBIDEAUX (#926) (Y: 10 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#563) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 2 AMENDMENT # 3876 BY BURRELL MOTION TO ADOPT (#561) (Y: 26 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2015-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 2 AMENDMENT # 3932 BY JACKSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#562) (Y: 41 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 2 AMENDMENT # 3802 BY BURRELL MOTION TO ADOPT (#560) (Y: 47 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 2 AMENDMENT # 3875 BY WILLIAMS A. MOTION TO ADOPT (#559) (Y: 35 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | House | Effective date: June 19, 2015. |
2015-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 26. |
2015-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/15/2015. |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House on June 15, 2015. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. |
2015-06-11 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 11. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2015-06-10 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2015-06-10 | House | House conferees appointed: Robideaux, Kleckley, and Leger. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Adley, and Alario. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2015-06-10 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2015-06-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2015-06-09 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/10/2015. |
2015-06-09 | House | Notice given. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2015-06-08 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-08 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 6/8/15. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2015-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-27 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 1 for 5/28/2015. |
2015-05-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). |
2015-05-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2015-05-26 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-22 | House | Read by title. |