LA HB2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Effective date: June 26, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Effective date: June 26, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget
Title
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 2 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#968) (Y: 86 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 ADOPT (#1068) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 2 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#922) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#885) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#447) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 ADOPT (#1068) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 2 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#922) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#885) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#447) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | House | Effective date: June 26, 2013. |
2013-06-26 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 24. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 86, nays 17. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2013-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Alario, and Broome. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2013-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Robideaux, Fannin, and Kleckley. |
2013-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2013-06-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/6/2013. |
2013-06-05 | House | Notice given. |
2013-06-04 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/5/2013. |
2013-06-04 | House | Notice given. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/04/2013. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 06/01. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-15 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2013. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (15-0) (Regular). |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (18-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-04-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-16 | House | Read by title. |