LA HB195 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to probation and the defendant's eligibility to earn compliance credits or early termination (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to probation and the defendant's eligibility to earn compliance credits or early termination (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 195 FINAL PASSAGE (#227) (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-03-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/18. |
2018-03-28 | House | Notice given. |
2018-03-28 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-03-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (8-7). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |