LA HB195 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides with respect to the office of coroner (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides with respect to the office of coroner (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 195 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#754) (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 195 FINAL PASSAGE (#609) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 195 FINAL PASSAGE (#285) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-29HouseEffective date: August 1, 2015.
2015-06-29HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 302.
2015-06-09HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2015-06-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-04HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 80, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2015-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015.
2015-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2015-05-28SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-27SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-05-26SenateReported with amendments.
2015-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2015-05-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2015-05-11HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2015-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/11/2015.
2015-05-05HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-05-04HouseReported favorably (16-0).
2015-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2015-03-30HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2015-03-30HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=HB195&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=932389
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=943620
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=946990
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=955844
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=960213
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944664
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=951527
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953063
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=953814
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=955464
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=932407
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=939046
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=943849
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=944247
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=946996
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=947112
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=951737
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957398
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=962405
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=946813
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=952903

Bill Comments

feedback