LA HB193 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-03 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the office on women's health within the La. Department of Health (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the office on women's health within the La. Department of Health (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 193 FINAL PASSAGE (#846) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2021-06-03SenateRules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
2021-06-01SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-05-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-27HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
2021-05-26HouseNotice given.
2021-05-20HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021.
2021-05-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-17HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2021-05-05HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-05-04HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-03-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021.
2021-03-24HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-03-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB193&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1206357
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220811
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225442
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220327
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220652
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225407
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225162
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1206362
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214910
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220950
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222277
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225487
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226331
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229499

Bill Comments

feedback