LA HB192 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for limitations on the prescribing of opioids

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for limitations on the prescribing of opioids

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 192 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#630) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#455) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 192 FINAL PASSAGE (#143) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12HouseEffective date: 08/01/17.
2017-06-12HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 82.
2017-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-06-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-02HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-01HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2017-05-26HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/01/17.
2017-05-23HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-22SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-18SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-17SenateReported favorably.
2017-05-08SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-05-03SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-02HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/02/17.
2017-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-04-26HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB192&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1028284
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036035
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047293
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1050996
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1034487
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035742
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1035967
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043353
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045350
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047157
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1028306
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036295
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1053345
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1038105
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044415

Bill Comments

feedback