LA HB191 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-28 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the rates and brackets for purposes of calculating individual income tax liability and eliminates certain deductions and credits (EG +$21,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Changes the rates and brackets for purposes of calculating individual income tax liability and eliminates certain deductions and credits (EG +$21,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Notice removed |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19. |
2019-05-23 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-23 | House | Notice removed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. |
2019-05-16 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19. |
2019-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-09 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-04-30 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported with amendments (9-2). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-26 | House | Prefiled. |