LA HB190 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain nurse practitioners to recommend medical marijuana to patients
Title
Authorizes certain nurse practitioners to recommend medical marijuana to patients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 190 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1586) (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 190 FINAL PASSAGE (#1329) (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 190 AMENDMENT # 3923 BY LUNEAU HB 190 BY JOHNSON T. (#1328) (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 190 FINAL PASSAGE (#500) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 190 FINAL PASSAGE (#1329) (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 190 AMENDMENT # 3923 BY LUNEAU HB 190 BY JOHNSON T. (#1328) (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 190 FINAL PASSAGE (#500) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 444. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 65, nays 31, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 58, nays 39. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2022. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-19 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-02-25 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/25/2022. |
2022-02-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-02-25 | House | Prefiled. |