LA HB19 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to membership in the Louisiana State Employees' Retirement System's Hazardous Duty Services Plan (EN INCREASE APV)
Title
Provides relative to membership in the Louisiana State Employees' Retirement System's Hazardous Duty Services Plan (EN INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 19 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1008) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#618) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#306) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#618) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#306) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 96. |
2022-05-24 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-23 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/19/2022. |
2022-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2022. |
2022-04-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2022-01-28 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/28/2022. |
2022-01-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2022-01-26 | House | Prefiled. |