LA HB19 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extends eligibility requirements for certain industries to participate in the Quality Jobs Program (Item #18) (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Extends eligibility requirements for certain industries to participate in the Quality Jobs Program (Item #18) (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on HB 19 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#170) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#157) (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 19 AMENDMENT # 562 BY JACKSON HB 19 BY PRESSLY (#156) (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote on HB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#45) (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#157) (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 19 AMENDMENT # 562 BY JACKSON HB 19 BY PRESSLY (#156) (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-16 - House - House Vote on HB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#45) (Y: 68 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2020. |
2020-07-13 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 29. |
2020-06-30 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 6, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2020-06-29 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-06-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/16/20. |
2020-06-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-10 | House | Reported favorably (11-2). |
2020-06-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |