LA HB19 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a funding deposit account for the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System and authorizes the board of trustees of the system to modify required employer contribution rates (RE DECREASE APV)
Title
Establishes a funding deposit account for the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System and authorizes the board of trustees of the system to modify required employer contribution rates (RE DECREASE APV)
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Bacala [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 19 HB 19 BY BACALA (#104) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-01-24 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/24/2020. |
2020-01-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-01-24 | House | Prefiled. |