LA HB19 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-28 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 53. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-28 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 53. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for continued effectiveness of reductions in the amount of certain rebates (Item #15) (EG +$11,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for continued effectiveness of reductions in the amount of certain rebates (Item #15) (EG +$11,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#22) (Y: 51 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 53. Failed to pass. |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/18. |
2018-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-25 | House | Reported with amendments (8-5). |
2018-05-24 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-05-24 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-05-22 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-05-22 | House | Prefiled. |