LA HB19 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits use of an unmanned aircraft system to conduct surveillance or collect information about a school, school premises, or correctional facilities
Title
Prohibits use of an unmanned aircraft system to conduct surveillance or collect information about a school, school premises, or correctional facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 19 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1220) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#1117) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#411) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#1117) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Vote on HB 19 FINAL PASSAGE (#411) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 539. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-20 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-20 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016. |
2016-04-13 | House | Notice given. |
2016-04-13 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-04-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/13/2016. |
2016-04-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-01-29 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/15/2016. |
2016-01-14 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-01-14 | House | Prefiled. |