LA HB19 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
Pending: House Administration of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds substances to Schedule I of the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds substances to Schedule I of the Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Law (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2014-01-17HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/17/2014.
2014-01-15HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2014-01-15HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback