LA HB189 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to capital outlay reform (RE NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to capital outlay reform (RE NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - House Vote on HB 189 FINAL PASSAGE (#440) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 41. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17. |
2017-05-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |