LA HB188 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to acceptance by a public servant of transportation, admission, and lodging given by a third party

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to acceptance by a public servant of transportation, admission, and lodging given by a third party

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 188 FINAL PASSAGE (#164) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-02SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-03-28HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18.
2018-03-22HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-21HouseReported favorably (7-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback