LA HB187 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-19-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 06/26/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-19-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 06/26/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Terminates the solar energy systems tax credit and provides relative to the payment of claims for the tax credit for purchased systems (EN -$15,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Terminates the solar energy systems tax credit and provides relative to the payment of claims for the tax credit for purchased systems (EN -$15,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 187 ADOPT (#956) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 187 MOTION TO ADOPT (#935) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 187 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#822) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 187 FINAL PASSAGE (#730) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 187 FINAL PASSAGE (#246) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 187 MOTION TO ADOPT (#935) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 187 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#822) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 187 FINAL PASSAGE (#730) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 187 FINAL PASSAGE (#246) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Effective date: 06/26/17. |
2017-06-26 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 413. |
2017-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017. |
2017-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, LaFleur, and Donahue. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Cromer, Abramson, and Bagley. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/17. |
2017-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |