LA HB182 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that no person shall be required to receive a COVID-19 vaccine as a condition of enrollment or attendance at any public or nonpublic school

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that no person shall be required to receive a COVID-19 vaccine as a condition of enrollment or attendance at any public or nonpublic school

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 182 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1057) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#845) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#348) (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2023-06-06HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 76, nays 23, Senate amendments concurred in.
2023-06-05HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
2023-06-05HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2023-06-05SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 13 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2023-06-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2023-06-02SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2023-06-01SenateReported with amendments.
2023-05-16SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2023-05-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2023-05-11HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2023-05-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2023.
2023-05-03HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-05-02HouseReported favorably (6-3-1).
2023-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2023-03-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/24/2023.
2023-03-24HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2023-03-24HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=23rs&b=HB182&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1305105
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1317984
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1331014
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1328318
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1328303
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1328249
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1305109
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1318362
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1328687
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330388
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1321650
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330161
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330648

Bill Comments

feedback