LA HB182 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Indian Child Welfare Act (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Indian Child Welfare Act (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#997) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Vote on HB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#59) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-11HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-10SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-10SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2018-05-09SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2018-05-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-02SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-01SenateReported favorably.
2018-03-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2018-03-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-03-20HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/20/18.
2018-03-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-14HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB182&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1068388
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075098
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077139
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095595
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100293
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074510
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075011
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075836
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1068400
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075245
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076072
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077194
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077669
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095933
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077037
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095562

Bill Comments

feedback