LA HB182 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 06/12/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Kenilworth Improvement District in Orleans Parish

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Kenilworth Improvement District in Orleans Parish

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#497) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#222) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12HouseEffective date: 06/12/17.
2017-06-12HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 80.
2017-05-31HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-05-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-05-25HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-05-25HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2017-05-25SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-24SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-23SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-22SenateReported favorably.
2017-05-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2017-05-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-09HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/09/17.
2017-05-01HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably (17-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2017-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2017-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback