LA HB182 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-05 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides with respect to the possession of alcoholic beverages by persons under the age of 21 years

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides with respect to the possession of alcoholic beverages by persons under the age of 21 years

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#919) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#609) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-05HouseEffective date: 08/01/2016.
2016-06-05HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 354.
2016-05-26HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2016-05-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2016-05-25HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2016-05-24HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2016-05-23SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-05-19SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-05-18SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-05-17SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2016-05-09SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2016-05-05SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2016-05-04HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2016-04-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2016.
2016-04-28HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-04-27HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2016-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2016-02-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2016.
2016-02-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2016-02-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback