LA HB182 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the promulgation of guidelines for determining the definition of "sale at retail" for purposes of the exemption from the sales and use tax for certain agricultural commodities utilized in preparing crops or animals for market (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the promulgation of guidelines for determining the definition of "sale at retail" for purposes of the exemption from the sales and use tax for certain agricultural commodities utilized in preparing crops or animals for market (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#866) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 182 FINAL PASSAGE (#399) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-17HouseEffective date: August 1, 2013.
2013-06-17HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 305.
2013-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2013-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2013-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2013-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2013-06-01SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-05-31SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-05-30SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-05-29SenateReported favorably.
2013-05-16SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2013-05-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2013-05-14HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2013-05-08HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2013.
2013-05-07HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2013-05-06HouseReported favorably (19-0) (Regular).
2013-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2013-03-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013.
2013-03-22HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2013-03-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=13rs&b=HB182&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=830848
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=845101
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=847726
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=854054
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=857586
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=845276
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=830860
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=843521
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=845183
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=845156
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=847827
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=848925
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=854439
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=859572
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=847831
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=853725

Bill Comments

feedback