LA HB179 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to devices authorized for use by the Right To Try Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to devices authorized for use by the Right To Try Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 179 CO-AUTHORS (#583) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 179 FINAL PASSAGE (#582) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 179 FINAL PASSAGE (#329) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12HouseEffective date: 08/01/17.
2017-06-12HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 292.
2017-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-06-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-02HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-05-31HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2017-05-31SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-25SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-25SenateRules suspended.
2017-05-24SenateReported favorably.
2017-05-18SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-05-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-17HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17.
2017-05-11HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-10HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback