LA HB179 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adds "blaze pink" as an alternative to the hunter orange requirements
Title
Adds "blaze pink" as an alternative to the hunter orange requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 179 FINAL PASSAGE (#390) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 179 CO-AUTHORS (#389) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Vote on HB 179 FINAL PASSAGE (#82) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 179 CO-AUTHORS (#389) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Vote on HB 179 FINAL PASSAGE (#82) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-05-05 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 7. |
2016-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-04-27 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 5. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/30/2016. |
2016-03-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2016-02-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2016. |
2016-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2016-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |