LA HB174 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date: June 23, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date: June 23, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the scheduling of controlled dangerous substances
Title
Provides with respect to the scheduling of controlled dangerous substances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 174 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#630) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 174 FINAL PASSAGE (#401) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 174 FINAL PASSAGE (#63) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 174 FINAL PASSAGE (#401) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 174 FINAL PASSAGE (#63) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | House | Effective date: June 23, 2015. |
2015-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 189. |
2015-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/01/2015. |
2015-05-19 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-04-27 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/27/2015. |
2015-04-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2015-03-27 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/27/2015. |
2015-03-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2015-03-26 | House | Prefiled. |