LA HB170 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to financial security for surviving spouses and children of certain cadets (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to financial security for surviving spouses and children of certain cadets (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 170 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#756) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 170 FINAL PASSAGE (#488) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 170 FINAL PASSAGE (#274) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-05-31HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2019-05-28HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/19.
2019-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-05-27SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-21SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-20SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2019-05-15SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-14SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-14HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (18-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-03-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB170&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118629
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129512
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140312
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128791
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129157
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135495
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137160
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138588
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140235
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118658
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124207
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129739
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130211
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135836
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141772
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133998
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137918

Bill Comments

feedback